TX HCR26 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating S. Javaid Anwar for being named the 2018 Top Hand by the Permian Basin Petroleum Association.
Title
Congratulating S. Javaid Anwar for being named the 2018 Top Hand by the Permian Basin Petroleum Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-01-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-01-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-01-16 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-01-15 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-01-03 | House | Filed |