TX HCR26 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to repeal the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Urging the United States Congress to repeal the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - HCR 26Third Reading House (Y: 116 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DODD-FRANK WALL STREET REFORM & CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress