TX HCR245 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Honoring the life of Shawn A. Edwards of Roxton.
Title
Honoring the life of Shawn A. Edwards of Roxton.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Rep. Mark Homer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-06-01 | Read & adopted | |
2009-05-26 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-25 | Adopted | |
2009-05-25 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-20 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-19 | Filed |