TX HCR21 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Honorable Rodney W. Satterwhite on his retirement from the 441st Judicial District Court.
Title
Congratulating the Honorable Rodney W. Satterwhite on his retirement from the 441st Judicial District Court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-03-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2018-12-07 | House | Filed |