TX HCR201 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of U.S. Army Private First Class Ira B. Laningham IV of Zapata.
Title
In memory of U.S. Army Private First Class Ira B. Laningham IV of Zapata.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-23 | House | Filed |