TX HCR199 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of U.S. Army Staff Sergeant Omar L. Aceves of El Paso.
Title
In memory of U.S. Army Staff Sergeant Omar L. Aceves of El Paso.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-23 | House | Filed |