TX HCR186 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make technical corrections to H.B. No. 3371.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make technical corrections to H.B. No. 3371.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - Adopted RV#1927 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - Adopted RV#1927 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Adopted HB 3371 |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1927 |
2019-05-25 | House | Adopted HB 3371 |
2019-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective