TX HCR174 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Requesting the Texas Department of Transportation to designate the overpass at the intersection of Highway 20 and Highway 338 in Odessa as the Buddy West Memorial Overpass.
Title
Requesting the Texas Department of Transportation to designate the overpass at the intersection of Highway 20 and Highway 338 in Odessa as the Buddy West Memorial Overpass.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Brown [R] | Rep. Warren Chisum [R] | Rep. Tom Craddick [R] | Rep. Delwin Jones [R] |
Rep. Susan King [R] | Rep. Tryon Lewis [R] | Rep. Thomas Merritt [R] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
Rep. David Swinford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-20 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-20 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-15 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Adopted | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-15 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-23 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-04-14 | Filed |
Subjects
BUDDY WEST MEMORIAL OVERPASS
Highways
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Highways
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous