TX HCR165 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the 2011 and 2012 Texas State Artist appointees.
Title
Honoring the 2011 and 2012 Texas State Artist appointees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-27 | Adopted | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Adopted | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2011-05-16 | Filed |
Subjects
FITZGIBBONS, BILL
GIBBONS, BILLY F.
LOVETT, LYLE
MILLER, MELISSA W.
MOROLES, JESUS
PARSONS, DAVID M.
POET LAUREATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous
SEALE, JAN
STATE ARTIST
STATE MUSICIAN
UMLAUF, KARL
GIBBONS, BILLY F.
LOVETT, LYLE
MILLER, MELISSA W.
MOROLES, JESUS
PARSONS, DAVID M.
POET LAUREATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous
SEALE, JAN
STATE ARTIST
STATE MUSICIAN
UMLAUF, KARL