TX HCR164 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Jean Hilfiger of Saint-Nabord, France, for his courageous actions in assisting U.S. military forces in France during World War II.
Title
Honoring Jean Hilfiger of Saint-Nabord, France, for his courageous actions in assisting U.S. military forces in France during World War II.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Read & adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-19 | Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-13 | Filed |