TX HCR158 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-35)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the federal government to grant a conditional green card to certain noncitizens to allow them to enlist in the United States armed forces and urging the federal government to award citizenship to these immigrants upon the completion of four years of honorable military service.
Title
Urging the federal government to grant a conditional green card to certain noncitizens to allow them to enlist in the United States armed forces and urging the federal government to award citizenship to these immigrants upon the completion of four years of honorable military service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Adopted | |
2011-05-20 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-05-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Aliens
Military & Veterans
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Military & Veterans
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress