TX HCR149 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Withdrawn from calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Withdrawn from calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the King Street Patriots for their commitment to freedom and election integrity.
Title
Recognizing the King Street Patriots for their commitment to freedom and election integrity.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-05 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HCR149 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HC00149I.htm |