TX HCR148 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Commending Elizabeth J. Nelson on her service as mayor of Marlin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Commending Elizabeth J. Nelson on her service as mayor of Marlin.



2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-28SenateRead & adopted
2017-05-27SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-25HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-05-24HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-05-24HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments