TX HCR147 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to work collectively toward a fair, equitable, and logical approach to federal transportation funding in any new federal transportation legislation considered.
Title
Urging Congress to work collectively toward a fair, equitable, and logical approach to federal transportation funding in any new federal transportation legislation considered.
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] |
Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous