TX HCR147 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging cities to promote long-term economic development and job growth by working together on the regional level to attract and retain business investment.
Title
Encouraging cities to promote long-term economic development and job growth by working together on the regional level to attract and retain business investment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Adopted | |
2011-05-23 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | |
2011-05-05 | Filed |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Intergovernmental Relations
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Intergovernmental Relations
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HCR147 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HC00147I.htm |