TX HCR146 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 1691.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 1691.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Adopted RV#1459 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Adopted RV#1459 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HALE COUNTY
Highways
NELDA LANEY SAFETY REST AREAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Highways
NELDA LANEY SAFETY REST AREAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous