TX HCR145 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Gregory D. Watson on having the overall course grade for his 1982 University of Texas American government class elevated from a C to an A after a wait of 35 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Gregory D. Watson on having the overall course grade for his 1982 University of Texas American government class elevated from a C to an A after a wait of 35 years.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-26SenateRead & adopted
2017-05-26SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-25HouseAdopted
2017-05-25HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-05-23HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-05-19HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-05-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback