TX HCR144 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating June 2 as Italian Heritage Day for a 10-year period, beginning in 2011.
Title
Designating June 2 as Italian Heritage Day for a 10-year period, beginning in 2011.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Adopted | |
2011-05-29 | Read | |
2011-05-29 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-20 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2011-04-29 | Filed |
Subjects
ITALIAN HERITAGE DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates