TX HCR142 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Clear Lake High School junior Cameron Blizzard on overcoming cancer.
Title
Congratulating Clear Lake High School junior Cameron Blizzard on overcoming cancer.
Sponsors
Rep. John Davis [R] | Rep. Jim Jackson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Read & adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-04-26 | Filed |