TX HCR140 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of representatives to provide for a joint interim legislative study regarding the confidentiality of emergency calls.
Title
Requesting the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of representatives to provide for a joint interim legislative study regarding the confidentiality of emergency calls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1810 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1810 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-05-11 | House | Filed |