TX HCR138 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 1919.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 1919.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HCR 138Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-28 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
Water--Development
Water--General
Parks & Wildlife--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
Water--Development
Water--General