TX HCR137 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating September as Suicide Prevention Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Title
Designating September as Suicide Prevention Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Adopted RV#959 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#959 |
2019-05-03 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
SUICIDE PREVENTION MONTH
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
SUICIDE PREVENTION MONTH