TX HCR134 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Joseph I. O'Neill III of Midland for his achievements as a business and civic leader.
Title
Honoring Joseph I. O'Neill III of Midland for his achievements as a business and civic leader.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-28 | House | Filed |