TX HCR134 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring Lamesa the Legendary Home of the Chicken-fried Steak.
Title
Declaring Lamesa the Legendary Home of the Chicken-fried Steak.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-04-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-19 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-04-19 | Read & adopted | |
2011-04-13 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-13 | Adopted | |
2011-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-08 | Filed |
Subjects
LAMESA, CITY OF
LEGENDARY HOME OF THE CHICKEN-FRIED STEAK
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous
LEGENDARY HOME OF THE CHICKEN-FRIED STEAK
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous