TX HCR128 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of U.S. Marine Corps Sergeant Jose Luis Saenz III of Pleasanton.
Title
In memory of U.S. Marine Corps Sergeant Jose Luis Saenz III of Pleasanton.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Aliseda [R] | Rep. John Garza [R] | Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R] | Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-11 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-04-11 | Signed in the House | |
2011-04-08 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-04-06 | Printed in full | |
2011-04-06 | Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Read | |
2011-04-06 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-06 | Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-04 | Filed |