TX HCR122 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the governor of the State of Texas to posthumously award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to Master Sergeant Travis E. Watkins.
Title
Directing the governor of the State of Texas to posthumously award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to Master Sergeant Travis E. Watkins.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Adopted RV#1047 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-04-12 | House | Filed |