TX HCR12 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-12 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-12 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
In memory of Texas game warden Teyran "Ty" Patterson of Seguin.
Title
In memory of Texas game warden Teyran "Ty" Patterson of Seguin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-03-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-03-09 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-03-05 | Signed in the House | |
2009-03-05 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-04 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-03-04 | Printed in full | |
2009-03-04 | Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Read | |
2009-03-04 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-03-04 | Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2008-11-14 | Filed |