TX HCR106 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to provide sufficient federal funding for the construction of a storm surge barrier along the Texas coast.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to provide sufficient federal funding for the construction of a storm surge barrier along the Texas coast.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - House - Adopted as amended RV#849 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAdopted
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-18SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAdopted as amended
2017-05-05HouseAmended
2017-05-05HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-02HousePostponed
2017-05-02HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-02HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback