TX HCR103 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the lieutenant governor and speaker to create a joint interim committee to study the impact of any proposals by the federal government to alter or abrogate NAFTA.
Title
Requesting the lieutenant governor and speaker to create a joint interim committee to study the impact of any proposals by the federal government to alter or abrogate NAFTA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Interim Studies
NORTH AMERICAN FREE TRADE AGREEMENT
NORTH AMERICAN FREE TRADE AGREEMENT--NAFTA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
NORTH AMERICAN FREE TRADE AGREEMENT
NORTH AMERICAN FREE TRADE AGREEMENT--NAFTA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy