TX HCR101 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to repeal the Government Pension Offset and the Windfall Elimination Provision of the Social Security Act.
Title
Urging Congress to repeal the Government Pension Offset and the Windfall Elimination Provision of the Social Security Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Adopted RV#1046 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
GOVERNMENT PENSION OFFSET
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
SOCIAL SECURITY ACT
WINDFALL ELIMINATION PROVISION
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
SOCIAL SECURITY ACT
WINDFALL ELIMINATION PROVISION