TX HCR10 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating James M. Alsup for receiving the West Texan by Nature Award from the Sibley Nature Center.
Title
Congratulating James M. Alsup for receiving the West Texan by Nature Award from the Sibley Nature Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-09-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-09-02 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-09-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-09-01 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-08-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-08-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-08-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-08-30 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-23 | House | Filed |