TX HB999 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring the election of directors of certain districts to be held on a uniform election date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring the election of directors of certain districts to be held on a uniform election date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - HB 999 Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-18HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenatePassed
2017-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-02SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-02SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-03-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-14HouseReferred to Elections
2017-03-14HouseRead first time
2017-01-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback