TX HB996 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the effect of certain agreements with a collective bargaining organization on certain state-funded public work contracts.
Title
Relating to the effect of certain agreements with a collective bargaining organization on certain state-funded public work contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - HB 996Third Reading House (Y: 97 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 996Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 3 by Rodriguez, Eddie (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Walle (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Walle (Y: 93 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 996Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 3 by Rodriguez, Eddie (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Walle (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Walle (Y: 93 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed |
2015-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Amendment tabled |
2015-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Amendment tabled |
2015-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Amendment tabled |
2015-05-06 | House | Point of order overruled |
2015-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-06 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-06 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Labor
Labor--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Labor
Labor--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State