TX HB992 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to excess undergraduate credit hours at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to excess undergraduate credit hours at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-19 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-18 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-18 | Record vote | |
2011-04-18 | Passed | |
2011-04-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-15 | Record vote | |
2011-04-15 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-15 | Record vote | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-04-15 | Amended | |
2011-04-15 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-15 | Postponed | |
2011-04-15 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-13 | Postponed | |
2011-04-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-01-28 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--General
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--General
Education--Junior College Districts