TX HB99 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the possession of two ounces or less of marihuana; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the possession of two ounces or less of marihuana; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses