TX HB987 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to equipment used or intended for use in testing or analyzing a controlled substance.
Title
Relating to equipment used or intended for use in testing or analyzing a controlled substance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1365 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Health
HB1365 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Health
SB623 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB1365 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Health
SB623 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Alcoholism & Drug Abuse
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB987 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00987I.htm |