TX HB976 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the appointment of a judge or magistrate to preside over a regional specialty court program and the authority of that judge or magistrate in cases referred to the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the appointment of a judge or magistrate to preside over a regional specialty court program and the authority of that judge or magistrate in cases referred to the program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#132
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-03-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1519 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback