TX HB967 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the age of criminal responsibility and to certain substantive and procedural matters related to that age.
Title
Relating to the age of criminal responsibility and to certain substantive and procedural matters related to that age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1552 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SB1552 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SB1552 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Crimes--Juvenile
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice