TX HB957 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to local, state, and federal regulation of firearm suppressors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to local, state, and federal regulation of firearm suppressors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#680 (Y: 95 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#680
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB543 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB957
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00957I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00957H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00957S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00957F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00957I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00957H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00957E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00957E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB957&RcdVtNo=680&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F1.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback