TX HB950 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the review of groundwater conservation districts by the state auditor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the review of groundwater conservation districts by the state auditor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-30 - House - HB 950Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-05SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2015-05-05SenateRead first time
2015-05-04SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseRecord vote
2015-04-30HousePassed
2015-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2015-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-08HousePosting rule suspended
2015-03-18HouseNo action taken in committee
2015-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-02HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2015-03-02HouseRead first time
2015-01-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback