TX HB942 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the storage of certain hazardous chemicals; transferring enforcement of certain reporting requirements, including the imposition of criminal, civil, and administrative penalties, from the Department of State Health Services to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty; reenacting a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the storage of certain hazardous chemicals; transferring enforcement of certain reporting requirements, including the imposition of criminal, civil, and administrative penalties, from the Department of State Health Services to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty; reenacting a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-16 See remarks for effective date
2015-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-21SenateRecord vote
2015-05-21SenatePassed
2015-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-21SenateRecord vote
2015-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-21SenateRecord vote
2015-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-05SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2015-05-05SenateRead first time
2015-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-04HouseRecord vote
2015-05-04HousePassed
2015-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-02HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2015-03-02HouseRead first time
2015-01-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback