TX HB941 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the determination that certain criminal offenses involve family violence.
Title
Relating to the determination that certain criminal offenses involve family violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-02-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-30 | Filed |