TX HB940 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-16 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-16 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain educator misconduct; imposing a penalty.
Title
Relating to certain educator misconduct; imposing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against