TX HB938 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increased oversight by the Department of State Health Services of hospitals that commit certain violations.
Title
Relating to increased oversight by the Department of State Health Services of hospitals that commit certain violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-12 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Hospitals
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Hospitals
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB938 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00938I.htm |