TX HB933 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition on the use of certain baseball bats at University Interscholastic League events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition on the use of certain baseball bats at University Interscholastic League events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCorrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-01HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2017-05-01HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2017-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-20HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback