TX HB933 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the imposition and use of certain court costs for breath alcohol testing programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the imposition and use of certain court costs for breath alcohol testing programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-20 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2011-04-20 Considered in formal meeting
2011-04-12 Left pending in committee
2011-04-12 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2011-04-12 Committee substitute considered in committee
2011-04-12 Considered in public hearing
2011-04-12 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2011-02-24 Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2011-02-24 Read first time
2011-01-26 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback