TX HB930 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to water well drillers and pump installers; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to water well drillers and pump installers; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-01 - House - HB 930Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-01 | House | Point of order overruled |
2015-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-01 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-01 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-18 | House | No action taken in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2015-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
WATER
WATER WELL DRILLERS & PUMP INSTALLERS
Water--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
WATER
WATER WELL DRILLERS & PUMP INSTALLERS
Water--General