TX HB925 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of the booting of vehicles; imposing an administrative penalty; changing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of the booting of vehicles; imposing an administrative penalty; changing a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback