TX HB923 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to property owners' association fines.
Title
Relating to property owners' association fines.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed |