TX HB918 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a license to carry a handgun for certain young adults who are protected under certain court orders related to family violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a license to carry a handgun for certain young adults who are protected under certain court orders related to family violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1236 (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#257 (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Amended RV#222 (Y: 134 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-03 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-18SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-18HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1236
2021-05-18HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-12HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-12HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-12HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenatePassed
2021-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-11SenateRecord vote
2021-05-11SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11SenateAmended
2021-05-11SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-05-11SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-11SenateRecord vote
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#257
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#222
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-14HouseAmended 1-Martinez Fischer
2021-04-14HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-04-14HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Martinez Fischer
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB918
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00918I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00918H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00918E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00918S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00918F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00918H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00918S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00918I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00918H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00918E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00918E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00918F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB918&RcdVtNo=222&Ch=H&Dt=04/14/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB918&RcdVtNo=257&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-11-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-12-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB918&RcdVtNo=1236&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback